Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023355446 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020167749 | 02.10.2020 | WO2021JP36528 | 01.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7401691B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2023 | B2 | JPWO2022071604 | 07.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020167749 | 02.10.2020 | WO2021JP36528 | 01.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116322590 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020167749 | 02.10.2020 | WO2021JP36528 | 01.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4205714 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2024 | A4 | EP4205714 | 05.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020167749 | 02.10.2020 | WO2021JP36528 | 01.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022071604 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020167749 | 02.10.2020 |