EP4184492 - METHOD FOR MANAGING PIXEL OF DISPLAY, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE SUPPORTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yilin Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jeonghun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Sungyoung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
UHM, Minsuk Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Hyunchang Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Sungdae Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
CHOI, Seungyeop Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21875929.8 | 02.08.2021 | [2023/21] | WO2021KR10060 | Priority number, date | KR20200127594 | 29.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200127594 | KR20210052294 | 22.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210052294 | [2023/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022071654 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184492 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/20, // G09G5/14 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G09G3/2003 (EP);
G09G3/2074 (US);
G09G3/2096 (US);
G09G3/3208 (US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP);
G09G2310/04 (US);
G09G2320/0242 (US);
G09G2320/028 (EP);
G09G2320/043 (US);
G09G2320/0613 (US);
G09G2320/0626 (US);
G09G2320/068 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0686 (EP);
G09G2358/00 (EP,US);
G09G2360/16 (EP);
G09G5/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/21] | G09G3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG DES PIXELS EINER ANZEIGE UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DAVON | [2023/21] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING PIXEL OF DISPLAY, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE SUPPORTING SAME | [2023/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DES PIXELS D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE PRENANT EN CHARGE | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2023 | Translation filed | 16.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20150028091 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5,11 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0022] - [0023] - [0069] , [0084] - [0086]; figures 1-11 *; | [XYI]KR20180135342 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0001] - [0023] - [0054] - [0074]; figures 1-13 * [Y] 3-5,10,11,14,15 [I] 2,6,7,9,12,13; | [Y]US2019180664 (SUN CHIA-YU [TW], et al) [Y] 14,15* paragraphs [0026] - [0028]; figure 4a *; | [Y]KR20200076317 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3,4,10 * paragraphs [0048] - [0071]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]KR101295217B (PUSAN NATIONAL UNIVERSITY INDUSTRY-UNIVERSITY COOPERATION FOUNDATION et al.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0029]; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR101374098B (LG DISPLAY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0060]-[0068] and [0102]-[0107]; and figures 3 and 13. *; | [A]KR20150028091 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0020] and [0083]-[0086]; and figures 10-11. *; | [A]KR20180135342 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0035] and [0057]-[0061]; claim 1; and figures 1 and 5-6. *; | [A]US2020006694 (LIM HYEONGJUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0030]-[0104]; and figures 1-2. * |