EP4228055 - ACCOMMODATING DEVICE AND ELECTRIC POWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Takashi Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Tsutomu Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/33] | Feller, Frank Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21877730.8 | 07.10.2021 | [2023/33] | WO2021JP37237 | Priority number, date | JP20200169849 | 07.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020169849 | JP20200169863 | 07.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020169863 | [2023/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022075431 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228055 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/46, H01R13/46, H01M50/204, H01M50/244 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H01M50/204 (EP,KR);
H01M50/202 (KR);
H02J7/0045 (US);
B60L53/80 (US);
H01M10/441 (EP,US);
H01M10/46 (EP,KR);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/6563 (EP,US);
H01M50/244 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/284 (KR);
H01M50/584 (KR);
H01R13/46 (KR);
H05K7/14 (US);
H05K7/20909 (US);
B60L53/302 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | AUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRISCHES ENERGIESYSTEM | [2023/33] | English: | ACCOMMODATING DEVICE AND ELECTRIC POWER SYSTEM | [2023/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LOGEMENT ET SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2023 | Translation filed | 04.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]JPS62164686U ; | [A]JPH05238324 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH09207626 (HARNESS SOGO GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [AY]JP2005093662 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) | by applicant | JPH10313543 | JPH1198613 | JP2018163757 |