EP4230716 - ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONTAINING LIMONENE, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING BITTERNESS OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONTAINING LIMONENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suntory Holdings Limited 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHII, Takaaki Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0284 / JP | 02 /
HATA, Yuto Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0284 / JP | 03 /
NAKAHARA, Koichi Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0284 / JP | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21880094.4 | 12.10.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021JP37684 | Priority number, date | JP20200173476 | 14.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020173476 | [2023/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022080355 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230716 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12G3/04, C12G3/06 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
C12G3/04 (EP);
C12G3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | LIMONENHALTIGES ALKOHOLISCHES GETRÄNK, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER BITTERKEIT EINES ALKOHOLISCHEN GETRÄNKS MIT LIMONEN | [2023/34] | English: | ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONTAINING LIMONENE, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING BITTERNESS OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE CONTAINING LIMONENE | [2023/34] | French: | BOISSON ALCOOLISÉE CONTENANT DU LIMONÈNE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE L'AMERTUME D'UNE BOISSON ALCOOLISÉE CONTENANT DU LIMONÈNE | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2023 | Translation filed | 14.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH03101690 (KANEBO LTD); | [Y]JP2002027968 (IKEDA SHOKKEN KK); | [YX]JP2016049051 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD); | [X]JP2016049053 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD); | [YX]JP2020124160 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD); | by applicant | JPH07250644 | JP2010057428 | JP2010119344 | JP2019097428 |