EP4229362 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING TRAFFIC VIOLATIONS USING MOBILE DETECTION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hayden AI Technologies, Inc. 494-B 9th Street Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHADIOK, Vaibhav Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
CARSON, Christopher Oakland, California 94612 / US | 03 /
SHEN, Bo Fremont, California 94539 / US | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/34] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21881288.1 | 21.07.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021US70921 | Priority number, date | US202017072816 | 16.10.2020 Original published format: US202017072816 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022082130 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4229362 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01C22/02, G01S19/33, G08G1/017, G08G1/127 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04N7/188 (EP,US);
G01C22/02 (US);
G01S19/33 (US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/2163 (US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N23/57 (EP);
H04N23/90 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (US);
B60R16/023 (US);
G06V20/625 (US);
G06V2201/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON VERKEHRSVERSTÖSSEN MIT MOBILEN DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/34] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING TRAFFIC VIOLATIONS USING MOBILE DETECTION DEVICES | [2023/34] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION DE VIOLATION DU TRAFIC À L'AIDE DE DISPOSITIFS DE DÉTECTION MOBILES | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014036076 (NERAYOFF STEVEN DAVID [US], et al); | [A]WO2016151554 (LIGHTMETRICS TECH PVT LTD [IN]); | [A]WO2017123665 (NETRADYNE INC [US]); | [A]US10296794 (RATTI JAYANT [US]); | [A]US2020257306 (NISENZON SEMYON [US]) |