EP4228645 - COMBINATIONS OF BCL-2 INHIBITORS WITH CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Recurium IP Holdings, LLC 10275 Science Center Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMATAR, Ahmed, Abdi San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
DONATE, Fernando San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
IZADI, Hooman San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
PINCHMAN, Joseph, Robert San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
BUNKER, Kevin, Duane San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
HUANG, Peter, Qinhua San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21881307.9 | 13.10.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021US71840 | Priority number, date | US202063092958P | 16.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063092958 P | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022082180 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228645 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496, A61K31/5355, A61K31/7068, A61K31/4184, A61K31/69, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61K39/05, A61K31/706, A61K31/7048, A61K31/704, A61K31/675, A61K31/573, A61K31/497, A61K31/475, A61K31/5377, A61K31/555, A61K38/05 | [2024/43] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,AU);
A61K31/496 (AU,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,AU);
A61K31/475 (EP);
A61K31/497 (EP);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP);
A61K31/69 (AU);
A61K31/704 (EP);
A61K31/7048 (EP);
A61K31/706 (EP,AU);
A61K31/7068 (EP,AU);
A61K38/05 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (EP,AU);
A61K31/475, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (AU);
A61K31/497, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/555, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/69, A61K2300/00 (AU);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/704, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP,AU); |
Former IPC [2023/34] | A61K31/496, A61K31/5355, A61K31/7068, A61K31/4184, A61K31/69, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN VON BCL-2-INHIBITOREN MIT CHEMOTHERAPEUTISCHEN MITTELN | [2023/34] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF BCL-2 INHIBITORS WITH CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2023/34] | French: | COMBINAISONS D'INHIBITEURS DE BCL-2 AVEC DES AGENTS CHIMIOTHÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2019139899 (ZENO ROYALTIES & MILESTONES LLC [US]); | [Y]WO2019139900 (ZENO ROYALTIES & MILESTONES LLC [US]); | [Y]WO2020024826 (ASCENTAGE PHARMA SUZHOU CO LTD [CN]); |