EP4195011 - CHARACTER DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BYTEDANCE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Room B-0035, 2/F, No.3 Building No. 30, Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHUGE, Jingjing Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
NI, Guangyao Beijing 100190 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Yepeng Beijing 100190 / CN | 04 /
SHEN, Yanhao Beijing 100190 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Hui Beijing 100190 / CN | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21881659.3 | 10.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021CN111846 | Priority number, date | CN202011143511 | 23.10.2020 Original published format: CN202011143511 | [2023/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022083240 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195011 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G06F3/0483 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
G06F40/109 (EP);
G06F3/04812 (CN);
G06F3/0483 (CN);
G06F40/106 (EP);
G06F40/53 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | ZEICHENANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/24] | English: | CHARACTER DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE DE CARACTÈRE, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2023 | Translation filed | 21.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 05.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |