EP4213304 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hanyang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yuanpeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Dawei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
SHI, Chuanbo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Xiaowei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21881817.7 | 23.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021CN119918 | Priority number, date | CN202011120282 | 19.10.2020 Original published format: CN202011120282 | [2023/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022083398 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213304 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/42, H01Q1/24, H01Q21/28, H01Q5/378 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q1/36 (CN);
H01Q1/22 (CN);
H01Q1/243 (US);
H01Q1/245 (EP);
H01Q1/38 (CN,US);
H01Q1/48 (CN);
H01Q1/50 (CN,US);
H01Q5/378 (EP);
H01Q9/42 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/29] | H01Q21/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/29] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2023 | Translation filed | 14.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 25.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH11312923 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [XA]US10276916 (HASABA RYOSUKE [JP], et al); | [XA]WO2020133111 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XA]CN111628274 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); |