EP4236493 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL BLOCK, AND DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yong Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Siqi Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21882061.1 | 20.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021CN125028 | Priority number, date | CN202011144254 | 22.10.2020 Original published format: CN202011144254 | [2023/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022083646 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4236493 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, H04L5/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP);
H04W56/003 (CN);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | H04W56/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES SYNCHRONISATIONSSIGNALBLOCKS SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL BLOCK, AND DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION D?UN BLOC DE SIGNAUX DE SYNCHRONISATION, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2023 | Translation filed | 18.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2018204351 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [Y] 6,12 * paragraph [0135] *[A] 1-5,7-11,13-15; | [YA]US2020007197 (KANG NAMKOO [KR]) [Y] 2,8 * paragraph [0045] * [A] 1,3-7,9-15; | [YA]US2020053673 (REIAL ANDRES [SE], et al) [Y] 3,9 * paragraphs [0033] - [0038] * [A] 1,2,4-8,10-15; | [XY]WO2020192892 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,5,7,11,13-15 * page 2, lines 1, 2 * * page 9, line 19 - page 11, line 28 * * figures 1, 5 * * page 2, lines 13, 14 * [Y] 2-4,6,8-10,12; | [YA] - ERICSSON, "On other enhancements for NTN", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20200817 - 20200828, (20200807), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2006466, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_102-e/Docs/R1-2006466.zip R1-2006466 On other enhancements for NTN.docx, (20200807), XP052347841 [Y] 4,10 * Section 4.3 * [A] 1-3,5-9,11-15 |