EP4232176 - ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE BUILDING BLOCKS WITH ANTI-SYMMETRIC CONTACT MECHANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qubee Ltd. C/o Impactech Group 40 Tuval St. 5252247 Ramat Gan / IL | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMOG, Boaz 7644721 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
MANSDORF, Nadav 9359006 Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
OREN, Eran 6934160 Tel Aviv / IL | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21882334.2 | 24.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021IL51258 | Priority number, date | US202063105315P | 25.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063105315 P | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022085010 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4232176 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/04, A63H33/08 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
A63H33/046 (EP,US);
A63H33/042 (EP,US);
A63H33/08 (EP);
A63H33/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGE BAUSTEINE MIT ANTISYMMETRISCHEN KONTAKTMECHANISMEN | [2023/35] | English: | ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE BUILDING BLOCKS WITH ANTI-SYMMETRIC CONTACT MECHANISMS | [2023/35] | French: | BLOCS DE CONSTRUCTION ÉLECTROCONDUCTEURS DOTÉS DE MÉCANISMES DE CONTACT ANTI-SYMÉTRIQUES | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Observations by third parties | 24.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN2111131U (CHEN ZHENGCHUN [CN]); | [A]US2009293268 (CARMI YOASH [IL]); | [A]US9017133 (ROLF THEODORUS SUIBERTUS ANTHONIUS [CH]); | [Y]US2016220919 (ALMOG BOAZ [IL], et al); | [Y]US2017291117 (ROH HEEJIN [KR]) |