Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023032692 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021KR09089 | 15.07.2021 | KR20200137207 | 22.10.2020 | KR20210090772 | 12.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220053462 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200137207 | 22.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7417736B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2024 | B2 | JP2023505975 | 14.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021KR09089 | 15.07.2021 | KR20200137207 | 22.10.2020 | KR20210090772 | 12.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114829494B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2024 | B | CN114829494 | 29.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021KR09089 | 15.07.2021 | KR20200137207 | 22.10.2020 | KR20210090772 | 12.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4056650 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2023 | A4 | EP4056650 | 14.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021KR09089 | 15.07.2021 | KR20200137207 | 22.10.2020 | KR20210090772 | 12.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022085899 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200137207 | 22.10.2020 | KR20210090772 | 12.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202216803 | 01.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200137207 | 22.10.2020 | KR20210090772 | 12.07.2021 |