Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230092896 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202063094292 | 20.10.2020 | WO2021KR14457 | 18.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4236517 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2024 | A4 | EP4236517 | 30.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063094292 | 20.10.2020 | WO2021KR14457 | 18.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022086077 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063094292 | 20.10.2020 |