EP4197193 - SIGNALING OF FEATURE MAP DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARABUTOV, Alexander Alexandrovich Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
SOSULNIKOV, Mikhail Vyacheslavovich Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
STEPIN, Victor Alexeevich Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ALSHINA, Elena Alexandrovna 80992 Munich / DE | 05 /
IKONIN, Sergey Yurievich Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/25] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21883397.8 | 20.10.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021RU50347 | Priority number, date | WO2020RU00559 | 20.10.2020 Original published format: PCT/RU2020/000559 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022086376 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4197193 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/176, H04N19/36, H04N19/46, H04N19/59, H04N19/96 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/42 (US);
G06N3/0464 (KR);
G06T9/002 (KR);
G06V10/82 (EP,KR);
G06V20/40 (EP,KR);
H04N19/119 (KR);
H04N19/13 (KR,US);
H04N19/136 (KR,US);
H04N19/154 (US);
H04N19/167 (US);
H04N19/17 (US);
H04N19/176 (EP);
H04N19/184 (KR,US);
H04N19/36 (EP);
H04N19/46 (EP);
H04N19/463 (KR);
H04N19/59 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | H04N19/90, G06T1/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNG VON MERKMALSKARTENDATEN | [2023/25] | English: | SIGNALING OF FEATURE MAP DATA | [2023/25] | French: | SIGNALISATION DE DONNÉES DE CARTE D'ATTRIBUTS | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | Divisional application(s) | EP24180959.9 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018027243 (HAGHANI EHSAN [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2016358069 (BROTHERS JOHN W [US], et al); | [A]EP3621304 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XY]US2020092552 (COELHO CLAUDIONOR [US], et al); | [A]CN110971901 (HANGZHOU HIKVISION DIGITAL TEC); | [A]US2020137384 (KWONG TAK WU SAM [HK], et al) |