Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
02.02.2024 | First examination report | |
01.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
05.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
10.08.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
04.08.2023 | Change - classification | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
04.08.2023 | Change - classification | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.06.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
23.06.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
01.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.04.2023 | Change - representative | |
21.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.05.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |