EP4206363 - HOT-PRESSED MEMBER AND STEEL SHEET FOR HOT-PRESSING, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR HOT-PRESSED MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Rinta Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Minoru Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
MIZUNO, Daisuke Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 04 /
NISHIIKE, Ryoto Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21885603.7 | 29.06.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021JP24435 | Priority number, date | JP20200180530 | 28.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020180530 | [2023/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022091480 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4206363 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/26, B21D22/20, B23K11/00, C21D1/18, C21D9/00, C22C38/00, C22C38/06, C22C38/60, C23C2/06, C23C2/18, C23C2/40, C25D5/50, C25D7/06, C25D5/02, B32B15/01, C25D5/16, C23C2/28, // C25D3/56, C25D3/22, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/32 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
C23C2/06 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/40 (EP,KR,US);
B21D22/022 (US);
B21D22/20 (KR);
B32B15/013 (EP);
C21D8/0247 (US);
C21D9/46 (KR,US);
C22C38/001 (KR,US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR);
C22C38/06 (KR,US);
C22C38/26 (US);
C22C38/28 (US);
C22C38/32 (EP,US);
C22C38/38 (US);
C22C38/60 (EP,US);
C23C2/18 (EP,KR);
C23C2/28 (EP);
C25D3/565 (EP,KR);
C25D5/028 (EP);
C25D5/16 (EP);
C25D5/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | C25D5/26, B21D22/20, B23K11/00, C21D1/18, C21D9/00, C22C38/00, C22C38/06, C22C38/60, C23C2/06, C23C2/18, C23C2/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | HEISSGEPRESSTES ELEMENT UND STAHLBLECH ZUM HEISSPRESSEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN HEISSGEPRESSTES ELEMENT | [2023/27] | English: | HOT-PRESSED MEMBER AND STEEL SHEET FOR HOT-PRESSING, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR HOT-PRESSED MEMBER | [2023/27] | French: | ÉLÉMENT PRESSÉ À CHAUD ET TÔLE D'ACIER POUR PRESSAGE À CHAUD, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION POUR ÉLÉMENT PRESSÉ À CHAUD | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2023 | Translation filed | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2646697 (NAT STEEL CORP) [X] 2 * page 9, lines 9-32 *; | [X]JPH01177348 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [X] 2 * abstract * * table 1 *; | [X]JPH04378 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 2 * abstract * * table 1 *; | [IA]DE102016225681 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0011] *[A] 3 | International search | [XY]JPS5789494 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [X] 2 * , p. 1, lower right column, lines 8-10, table 2 * [Y] 1, 3; | [XY]JPH01177348 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [X] 2 * , p. 2, lower right column, line 19, examples, table 1 * [Y] 1, 3; | [Y]JPH03170694 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 1 * , claims, p. 2, lower right column, lines 5-10 *; | [XY]JPH04378 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 2 * , examples, table 1 * [Y] 1, 3; | [Y]WO2020049833 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [Y] 3* , paragraphs [0038], [0041] * | by applicant | JP2004323897 | JP2011246801 |