EP4240081 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 2050 W 190th Street Suite 450 Torrance, CA 90504 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAI, Takashi Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TAKATA, Tomofumi Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
URABE, Yoshio Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
NAKANO, Takayuki Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
MIURA, Taichi Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21885613.6 | 13.07.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021JP26325 | Priority number, date | JP20200180361 | 28.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020180361 | [2023/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022091490 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4240081 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/00, // H04W84/12 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04W74/006 (EP);
H04W74/002 (KR);
H04W72/232 (US);
H04L5/0007 (KR);
H04L5/0037 (KR);
H04L5/0053 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2023/36] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2023/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2023 | Translation filed | 25.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2020112021 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); | by applicant | JP2020180361 |