EP4238706 - ROBOT HAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORYU, Tamami Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6508670 / JP | 02 /
WADA, Hisao Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6508670 / JP | 03 /
MURASE, Yohei Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6508670 / JP | 04 /
FUKUDA, Hiroaki Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6508670 / JP | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Puschmann Borchert Kaiser Klettner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21885838.9 | 05.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021JP36878 | Priority number, date | JP20200181378 | 29.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020181378 | [2023/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022091719 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4238706 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B25J3/00, B25J15/08, B25J15/00, B25J15/02 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
B25J15/0286 (EP,US);
B25J15/0047 (EP);
B25J9/104 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | B25J3/00, B25J15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | ROBOTERHAND | [2023/36] | English: | ROBOT HAND | [2023/36] | French: | MAIN DE ROBOT | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2023 | Translation filed | 26.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2137160 (NAT RES DEV); | [XA]JPH11347979 (JAPAN SERVO); | [XAI]US2010207412 (OKAZAKI YASUNAO [JP], et al); | [XAI]CN109769478 (UNIV SHIHEZI); | [XA]CN110640782 (UNIV XIDIAN) | International search | [A]JP2007203402 (NIDEC SANKYO CORP); | [A]JP2012066357 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]JP2019034371 (IHI LOGISTICS & MACHINERY CORP) | by applicant | JPS6299094 |