blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4238734

EP4238734 - LATEX COMPOSITION AND DIP MOLDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.08.2023
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.05.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2025The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
19.02.2025Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zeon Corporation
6-2, Marunouchi, 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
[2023/36]
Inventor(s)01 / KODEMURA, Junji
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
 [2023/36]
Representative(s)Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2023/36]Beckmann, Claus
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date21885847.006.10.2021
[2023/36]
WO2021JP37014
Priority number, dateJP2020017970827.10.2020         Original published format: JP 2020179708
[2023/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022091728
Date:05.05.2022
Language:JA
[2022/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4238734
Date:06.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.05.2022
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2024
ClassificationIPC:B29C41/14, B29C41/36, B29K9/00, B29L24/00, C08L7/02, C08L9/10, C08L53/02, C08L83/12
[2023/36]
CPC:
B29C41/14 (EP,US); C08F236/08 (US); B29C41/22 (EP);
C08F279/02 (EP); C08K3/06 (US); C08K5/38 (US);
C08L51/003 (EP); C08L51/04 (EP); C08L53/02 (US);
C08L7/02 (EP,US); C08L83/12 (EP,US); B29K2009/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0064 (EP); B29K2909/08 (EP); B29L2024/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/4864 (EP); C08G77/46 (EP); C08L2201/52 (US) (-)
C-Set:
C08F279/02, C08F220/06 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L71/00 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L71/00, C08K5/0025 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L71/00, C08K5/38 (EP);
C08L7/02, C08L71/00, C08K5/0025 (EP);
C08L7/02, C08L71/00, C08K5/38 (EP)
(-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/36]
TitleGerman:LATEXZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND TAUCHFORMKÖRPER[2023/36]
English:LATEX COMPOSITION AND DIP MOLDED BODY[2023/36]
French:COMPOSITION DE LATEX ET CORPS MOULÉ PAR IMMERSION[2023/36]
Entry into regional phase26.04.2023Translation filed 
26.04.2023National basic fee paid 
26.04.2023Search fee paid 
26.04.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
26.04.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2023Examination requested  [2023/36]
19.02.2025Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2025Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP3587820B  ;
 [X]JP2020037635  (MIDORI ANZEN CO LTD);
 [A]JP2020100076  (NIPPON ZEON CO)
International search[A]JPS61282478  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS);
 [A]JPH08509134  ;
 [A]JP2004256615  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO);
 [PAPX]JP2021001253  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND)
by applicantJP2020037635
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.