EP4249052 - COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING INTESTINAL BACTERIAL FLORA AND COMPOSITION FOR SUPPRESSING PRODUCTION OF SUBSTANCES BY INTESTINAL PUTREFACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahimatsu Foods Co., Ltd. 1008 Dashina Iida City, Nagano 399-2561 / JP | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA Yasunori Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8605 / JP | 02 /
TOYOHARA Kiyotsuna Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8605 / JP | 03 /
ISHIGURO Takahiro Iida City, Nagano 3992561 / JP | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21885855.3 | 07.10.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021JP37126 | Priority number, date | JP20200181582 | 29.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020181582 | [2023/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022091736 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4249052 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61P1/00, A61P1/14, A61P43/00, A61K36/48, A23L33/00, A23L33/125, A23L33/17, A61K38/02, A61K31/715, A23L33/21, A61K31/733, A61K38/01 | [2024/37] | CPC: |
A61P1/00 (EP);
A23L33/21 (EP);
A61K31/733 (EP);
A61K38/011 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/733, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/011, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/39] | A61P1/00, A61P1/14, A61P43/00, A61K36/48, A23L33/00, A23L33/125, A23L33/17, A61K38/02, A61K31/715 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER DARMBAKTERIENFLORA UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG DER PRODUKTION VON SUBSTANZEN DURCH DARMVERROTTUNG | [2023/39] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING INTESTINAL BACTERIAL FLORA AND COMPOSITION FOR SUPPRESSING PRODUCTION OF SUBSTANCES BY INTESTINAL PUTREFACTION | [2023/39] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR AMÉLIORATION DE LA FLORE BACTÉRIENNE INTESTINALE, ET COMPOSITION POUR INHIBITION DE LA PRODUCTION DE MATIÈRE PUTRÉFIÉE INTESTINALE | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | Translation filed | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011052538 (BROWN IAN LEWIS [AU], et al); | [X]CN110179108 (SHANGHAI POLARIS HEALTH CO LTD); | International search | [A]JP2006169204 (MARUTOMO KK); | [A]JP2013510865 ; | [X]JP2017508450 ; | [A]WO2018056284 (MEIJI CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2018050526 (TEIJIN LTD); | [X]CN110179108 (SHANGHAI POLARIS HEALTH CO LTD); | [A]JP2020130093 (TEIJIN LTD); | by applicant | WO2007142306 | JP2014240431 | JP2016028595 |