EP4207790 - DISPLAY APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jaeseong Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Jeongwoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
LIM, Daesung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Myoungkoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Yunho Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21886699.4 | 21.10.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021KR14831 | Priority number, date | KR20200140957 | 28.10.2020 Original published format: KR 20200140957 | [2023/27] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022092705 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4207790 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/485, H04N21/431, H04N5/265, H04N21/442, G06T1/20, G09G5/397 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H04N21/4854 (EP,KR);
H04N5/272 (US);
G06T1/20 (US);
G09G5/397 (EP);
H04N21/4312 (EP,KR);
H04N21/4316 (EP);
H04N21/44218 (KR);
H04N5/265 (KR);
G09G2340/10 (EP);
G09G2340/125 (EP);
G09G2360/06 (EP);
G09G5/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | H04N21/485, H04N21/431, H04N5/265, H04N21/442 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/27] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/27] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2023 | Translation filed | 28.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2861938 (SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2007223882 (KUNO SHINJI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US7310104 (MACINNIS ALEXANDER G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2016078664 (MIZUGUCHI TAKEHISA [JP], et al) [I] 1-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0066] , [0 96] *; | [A]US2017308261 (LEE BYUNGHUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2022030892 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-7,9-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20110026806 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0031]; claims 1-9; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]KR20130078296 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0031]; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20160122027 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0050]; claims 1-6; and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20180071619 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0130]-[0132]; and figures 6-7. *; | [A]KR20190132072 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-11. * |