EP4237659 - SINGULAR/WIRED FUZING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pundole, Faraidoon 715 Fairpark Lane Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Jensen, Anders Damgaard Novagraaf UK 3rd Floor 77 Gracechurch Street London EC3V 0AS / GB | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21887409.7 | 27.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021US56785 | Priority number, date | US202063106740P | 28.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063106740 P | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022093913 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4237659 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/1185, F42B3/12, F42B3/13, F42B3/18, F42D1/05, F42D3/00, H04L27/10, E21B47/12 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
F42D1/05 (EP,US);
E21B43/1185 (EP,US);
E21B47/12 (EP,US);
F42D1/055 (US);
H04L27/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | E21B43/1185, F42B3/12, F42B3/13, F42B3/18, F42D1/05, F42D3/00, H04L27/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | SINGULÄRE/DRAHTGEBUNDENE FUSING-VORRICHTUNG | [2023/36] | English: | SINGULAR/WIRED FUZING DEVICE | [2023/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALLUMAGE SINGULIER/À FIL | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 06.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005285686 (PETTERSEN FRED-JOHAN [NO], et al); | [YA]US2012168226 (BROOKS JAMES E [US], et al); | [XYA]US2014151018 (LERCHE NOLAN C [US], et al); | [Y]US2014261039 (KOEKEMOER ANDRE [ZA], et al); |