EP4185218 - MODULAR GUIDE SYSTEM FOR SURGICAL PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wright Medical Technology, Inc. 1023 Cherry Road Memphis, TN 38117 / US | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYNOLDS, David G. Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 02 /
ALSPAUGH, Julia C. Memphis, TN 38111 / US | 03 /
STEMNISKI, Paul M. Memphis, TN 38122 / US | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21887499.8 | 28.10.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021US57014 | Priority number, date | US202063108577P | 02.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063108577 P | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022094052 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4185218 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/15, A61B17/17 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
A61B17/1775 (EP,US);
A61B17/15 (EP);
A61B17/56 (US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B2017/568 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/108 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | MODULARES FÜHRUNGSSYSTEM FÜR CHIRURGISCHE VERFAHREN | [2023/22] | English: | MODULAR GUIDE SYSTEM FOR SURGICAL PROCEDURES | [2023/22] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉLÉMENT GUIDE MODULAIRE POUR INTERVENTIONS CHIRURGICALES | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 28.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010212138 (CARROLL MICHAEL [US], et al); | [XYA]US2012271314 (STEMNISKI PAUL [US], et al); | [YA]US2014163570 (REYNOLDS DAVID [US], et al); | [YA]US2015257900 (DEES JR ROGER RYAN [US]); | [A]US2018177513 (STEMNISKI PAUL M [US], et al); | [Y]US2019150957 (WILKINSON ZACHARY CHRISTOPHER [US]); | [A]US2020046374 (LUTTRELL PAUL [US], et al); | [XYA]US2020297353 (BOMAR BRADLEY [US], et al) |