EP4237092 - STAT-ACTIVATED MACROPHAGES, COMPOSITIONS, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The George Washington University, A Congressionally Chartered Not-For-Profit Corporation 1922 F Street NW, 4th Floor Washington, DC 20052 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLAGRA, Alejandro Falls Church, Virginia 22043 / US | 02 /
NOONEPALLE, Satish McLean, Virginia 22102 / US | 03 /
HERNANDEZ, Maria del Mar Gracia Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21887660.5 | 29.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021US57418 | Priority number, date | US202063108027P | 30.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063108027 P | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022094319 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4237092 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/42, A61P35/00, A61K31/00, A61K48/00, A61K31/4709, A61K31/55 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K39/4614 (US);
A61K31/42 (EP);
A61K31/4709 (EP);
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61K35/15 (US);
A61K39/4644 (US);
A61K39/464451 (US);
A61K39/464456 (US);
A61K39/46447 (US);
A61K39/464481 (US);
A61K39/464482 (US);
A61K39/464486 (US);
A61K39/464488 (US);
A61K39/46449 (US);
A61K39/464491 (US);
A61K39/464495 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
C12N5/0645 (US);
A61K2039/5154 (US);
C12N2501/2304 (US);
C12N2501/2313 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | A61P35/00, A61K31/00, A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | STAT-AKTIVIERTE MAKROPHAGEN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/36] | English: | STAT-ACTIVATED MACROPHAGES, COMPOSITIONS, AND USES THEREOF | [2023/36] | French: | MACROPHAGES ACTIVÉS PAR STAT, COMPOSITIONS ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 08.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010297061 (YU HUA [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2007060521 (JOVE RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]US2020222557 (BERLIN JACOB [US], et al); |