Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4243373
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.09.2024 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
30.08.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
30.08.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
05.01.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
05.01.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
11.08.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
11.08.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
17.07.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.05.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
09.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|