EP4241626 - CUSHIONING BODY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airweave Inc. 28, Aza-Arai, Oaza-Ogi Kota-cho, Nukata-gun Aichi 444-0115 / JP | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZUNO, Akira Nukata-gun, Aichi 444-0115 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Yusuke Nukata-gun, Aichi 444-0115 / JP | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Kurig, Thomas Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21888988.9 | 13.10.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021JP37855 | Priority number, date | JP20200184358 | 04.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020184358 | [2023/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022097435 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4241626 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47G9/10 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
A47G9/1081 (EP,US);
A47G9/109 (EP);
D04H3/018 (US);
D04H3/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | DÄMPFUNGSKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/37] | English: | CUSHIONING BODY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2023/37] | French: | CORPS D'AMORTISSEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2023 | Translation filed | 30.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6513179 (PAN CHIEN-LIANG [TW]); | [Y]JP3103115U ; | [YX]JP2005066134 (SHIIENJI KK); | [Y]JP2017226230 (SHIIENJI KK) | by applicant | WO2018150815 |