EP4242146 - POWDER SUPPLY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsukasa Co., Ltd. 178 Nakauma-cho Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8550 / JP | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKI Tomonori Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8550 / JP | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/37] | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 21889163.8 | 01.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021JP40286 | Priority number, date | JP20200184018 | 03.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020184018 | [2023/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022097610 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4242146 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/30, G01G19/34, B65G65/00, B65G65/32 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
B65G65/005 (EP,US);
B65G65/40 (KR);
B65G65/32 (EP,US);
G01G19/306 (EP);
G01G19/346 (EP);
B65G2201/0235 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | B65G65/40, B65G65/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | PULVERZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG | [2023/37] | English: | POWDER SUPPLY APPARATUS | [2023/37] | French: | APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION EN POUDRE | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2023 | Translation filed | 22.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013038394 (WEICOM S R L [IT], et al) | International search | [Y]JPH06174537 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0007]-[0012], fig. 1 *; | [Y]JP2000136025 (DAIWA SEIKO INC) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [0005]-[0006], [0010], fig. 1 *; | [Y]JP2001130748 (TSUKASA IND) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0011]-[0012], [0015]-[0021], fig. 1-6 *; | [A]JP2005007387 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD)[A] 1-4; | [Y]JP2014055775 (SATO NOKI CHUZO KK) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0011]-[0013], fig. 2 *; | [Y]JP2014232006 (YAMATO SCALE CO LTD) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0057], [0061], fig. 1 * | by applicant | JP2001201393 |