EP4242270 - AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION, AND COATED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South 1-13-1, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Yuki Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 02 /
OKUNO, Shingo Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 03 /
KOMORI, Hirokazu Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 04 /
NAKATANI, Yasukazu Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 05 /
YAMAUCHI, Akiyoshi Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2024/26] |
Former [2023/37] | 01 /
UEDA, Yuki Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | ||
02 /
OKUNO, Shingo Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | |||
03 /
KOMORI, Hirokazu Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKATANI, Yasukazu Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMAUCHI, Akiyoshi Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21889231.3 | 04.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021JP40584 | Priority number, date | JP20200185952 | 06.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020185952 | [2023/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022097678 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4242270 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C09D123/28, C09D127/10, C09D7/61, H05K1/03, C09D7/40 | [2024/39] | CPC: |
C09D7/61 (EP,KR,US);
C09D127/12 (KR,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,KR);
C08L27/18 (EP);
C09D127/18 (EP);
C09D5/02 (KR);
C09D5/024 (EP,KR);
C09D7/20 (EP,KR);
C09D7/45 (EP);
C09D7/47 (EP,US);
C09D7/69 (EP,KR);
H05K1/03 (KR);
H05K1/0373 (EP,US);
C08F214/262 (EP);
C08K2201/005 (EP);
C08K2201/01 (EP);
C08L2205/03 (EP);
H05K1/034 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L27/18, C08K5/06, C08L83/12 (EP);
C09D127/18, C08K13/02, C08L83/12 (EP);
C09D127/18, C08K3/36, C08L83/12 (EP);
C09D127/18, C08L83/12, C08L29/04, C08K13/02 (EP); |
Former IPC [2023/37] | C09D5/00, C09D123/28, C09D127/10, C09D7/61, H05K1/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL | [2023/37] | English: | AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION, AND COATED ARTICLE | [2023/37] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT AQUEUSE, ET ARTICLE REVÊTU | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2023 | Translation filed | 24.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2255931 (ROGERS CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0614941 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [T]US5895724 (TEEGARDEN DAVID M [US], et al); | [T]EP0542893 (DU PONT [US]); | [XYI]JP2007266606 (ENDICOTT INTERCONNECT TECH INC); | International search | [A]JPS59147057 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [Y]WO9405729 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [YX]JP2544530B ; | [Y]WO2010050572 (THREE BOND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2018016644 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPH05301974 | WO9405729 | JP2009001767 | WO2018016644 | WO2020071382 |