Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023266027 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021TR50704 | 08.07.2021 | TR202017522 | 03.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4241021 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021TR50704 | 08.07.2021 | TR202017522 | 03.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022098326 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TR202017522 | 03.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR202017522 | 23.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TR202017522 | 03.11.2020 |