EP4241021 - AN AIR PURIFIER DETECTING ERRORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi Sutluce Karaagac Caddesi No: 2/6 Beyoglu 34445 Istanbul / TR | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARKUÇ, Simge 34445 Beyoglu/Istanbul / TR | 02 /
KANDEM R, Nihat 34445 Beyoglu/Istanbul / TR | 03 /
ÇOBAN, Burak 34445 Beyoglu/Istanbul / TR | 04 /
ER, Dilan 34445 Beyoglu/Istanbul / TR | 05 /
KESK N, Ege 34445 Beyoglu/Istanbul / TR | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21889744.5 | 08.07.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021TR50704 | Priority number, date | TR20200017522 | 03.11.2020 Original published format: TR 202017522 | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022098326 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4241021 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 12.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F24F8/00, B01D46/00, F24F11/38 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
F24F8/15 (EP,US);
F24F11/38 (EP,US);
B01D53/346 (US);
B01D53/62 (US);
B01D53/78 (US);
B01D53/965 (US);
B01D61/46 (US);
F24F11/49 (EP);
F24F11/64 (EP);
F24F7/003 (EP);
F24F8/192 (EP);
B01D2257/504 (US);
B01D2259/4508 (US);
F24F2110/70 (EP,US);
F24F2140/00 (US);
Y02C20/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | F24F8/00, B01D46/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | FEHLER ERKENNENDER LUFTREINIGER | [2023/37] | English: | AN AIR PURIFIER DETECTING ERRORS | [2023/37] | French: | PURIFICATEUR D'AIR DÉTECTANT DES ERREURS | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2530089 (AIRFILT LTD [GB]); | [A]CN108758856 (SICHUAN JIANYUAN ENERGY SAVING TECH CO LTD); | [A]WO2018206682 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]CN111121185 (FANCHANG DONGFANG CLOTHING CO LTD) |