EP4241039 - CONTAINER UTILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bluex Trade, Inc. 20955 Pathfinder Road, Suite 230 Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Huang-Yu Taipei City / TW | 02 /
CHIANG, Vivian Taipei City / TW | 03 /
O'MALLEY, Sean Taipei City / TW | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Herre, Peter, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21890234.4 | 08.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021US58446 | Priority number, date | US202063111620P | 09.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063111620 P | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022099127 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4241039 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/083, G06Q10/0835, G06Q10/0631, G06Q10/20, G01B11/14 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0838 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0835 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06315 (EP,US);
G06Q10/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | G01B11/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BEHÄLTERN | [2023/37] | English: | CONTAINER UTILIZATION | [2023/37] | French: | UTILISATION DE CONTENEURS | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005278063 (HERSH RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 34] , [0 79] - [0089] * [Y] 2 [I] 3-12; | [Y]US2018347895 (JONSSON RAGNAR INGI [DK], et al) [Y] 2* paragraphs [0033] , [0 42] , [0 43] * |