Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023280874 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200149902 | 11.11.2020 | WO2021KR15607 | 01.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116472509 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200149902 | 11.11.2020 | WO2021KR15607 | 01.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4242823 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2024 | A4 | EP4242823 | 13.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200149902 | 11.11.2020 | WO2021KR15607 | 01.11.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022103040 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200149902 | 11.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220063936 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200149902 | 11.11.2020 |