EP4244539 - HOT WATER CIRCULATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EnergyBooster AB Kvarnvägen 11 663 40 Hammarö / SE | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSSIANSSON, Willy 663 31 Skoghall / SE | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Noréns Patentbyrå AB Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21892441.3 | 16.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021SE51147 | Priority number, date | SE20200051338 | 16.11.2020 Original published format: SE 2051338 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022103323 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4244539 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F24D17/00, F24D3/08, F24D3/18, F24D17/02, F24D19/10, E03B7/04, F24H15/156, F24H15/174, F24H15/219 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
F24D19/1054 (EP,SE);
F24D17/0078 (EP,SE);
F24D17/0026 (EP,SE);
F24D17/0089 (SE);
F24D17/02 (EP,SE);
F24D19/1051 (SE);
F24D3/08 (EP,SE);
F24D3/18 (EP,SE);
F24H15/156 (EP,SE);
F24H15/174 (EP,SE);
F24H15/219 (EP,SE);
F24H15/325 (SE);
E03B7/045 (EP,SE);
F24D17/00 (SE);
F24D19/10 (SE);
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | F24D17/00, F24D3/08, F24D3/18, F24D17/02, F24D19/10, E03B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | WARMWASSER-ZIRKULATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2023/38] | English: | HOT WATER CIRCULATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME | [2023/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CIRCULATION D'EAU CHAUDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3342273 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]); | [Y]FR2936042 (HELIOPAC [FR]); | [A]EP2966384 (BETTER PLACE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US10132507 (DEIVASIGAMANI SRIDHAR [US], et al); | [A]EP3569936 (DANFOSS AS [DK]); | [A]EP3705789 (GEBR KEMPER GMBH + CO KG METALLWERKE [DE]) | International search | [A]JPH04260749 (PALOMA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-15 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: EPODOC database; Original document: figure 1; See machine translation abstract and paragraphs [0006]-[0008], [0010], [0012], [0015]-[0018]. *; | [A]JPH04260731 (KAJIMA CORP) [A] 1-15 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: EPODOC database; Original document: figures 1-2; See machine translation abstract and paragraphs [0012]-[0014]. *; | [A]JP2004125228 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: EPODOC database; Original document: figures 1, 3; See machine translation abstract and paragraphs [0029]-[0030]. *; | [A]DE102005036882 (HERRMANN REINHOLD [DE]) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; paragraph [0014]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2009180768 (MOORE LYNDAL [US]) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0005]-[0006], [0028]-[0031]; figures 3-4 *; | [A]WO2013005976 (KYUNGDONG NAVIEN CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* ; (abstract) Retrieved from: EPODOC database; Original document: figures 6-7; See machine translation abstract. *; | [A]JP2013015263 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: EPODOC database; Original document: figure 3; See machine translation abstract and paragraphs [0011], [0033]-[0035], [0046]-[0049]. *; | [A]WO2016029067 (DEIVASIGAMANI SRIDHAR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; page 7, line 8 - line 16; page 10, line 27 - line 35; figures 1, 3a *; | [A]JP2017182939 (MIURA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-15 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: EPODOC database; Original document: figure 1; See machine translation abstract and paragraphs [0027], [0041], [0050], [0055]. *; | [A]CN210373667U (SHANGHAI LINGBEI HEATING AND COOLING EQUIPMENT ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: EPODOC database; Original document: figures 1-3; See machine translation abstract, lines 63-80, 127-136, 198-209, 224-243. *; | [A]US2020271356 (HASEGAWA TAKAHIDE [JP]) [A] 1-15 * ; paragraphs [0025]-[0026], [0037], [0039], [0049]-[0050], [0090]-[0092]; figures 1, 3-4, 9 * |