EP4232605 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSING AND TREATING PROSTATE CANCER BASED ON LONG NONCODING RNA OVERLAPPING THE LCK GENE THAT REGULATES PROSTATE CANCER CELL GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Virginia Patent Foundation 22 Preston Avenue, Suite 107 Charlottesville, VA 22903 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIOELI, Daniel, G. Charlottesville, VA 22903 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21892828.1 | 11.11.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021US59022 | Priority number, date | US202017095511 | 11.11.2020 Original published format: US202017095511 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022103988 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4232605 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886, C12Q1/686 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/106 (EP);
C12Q2600/118 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP);
C12Q2600/178 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Extension states | BA | 22.05.2023 | ME | 22.05.2023 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON PROSTATAKREBS AUF BASIS VON LANGER NICHTCODIERENDER RNA, DIE DAS LCK-GEN ÜBERLAPPEN, DAS PROSTATAKREBSZELLWACHSTUM REGULIERT | [2023/35] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSING AND TREATING PROSTATE CANCER BASED ON LONG NONCODING RNA OVERLAPPING THE LCK GENE THAT REGULATES PROSTATE CANCER CELL GROWTH | [2023/35] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER ET TRAITER UN CANCER DE LA PROSTATE SUR LA BASE D'UN ARN LONG NON CODANT CHEVAUCHANT LE GÈNE LCK RÉGULANT LA CROISSANCE DES CELLULES DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010129804 (CHINNAIYAN ARUL M [US], et al); |