EP4244205 - IRE1ALPHA INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Twelfth Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states University of Washington 4545 Roosevelt Way NE, Suite 400 Seattle, WA 98105-4721 / US | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPA, Feroz, R. San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 02 /
BACKES, Bradley, J. San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 03 /
MALY, Dustin, J. Seattle, WA 98117 / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21892934.7 | 12.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021US59255 | Priority number, date | US202063113543P | 13.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063113543 P | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022104148 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4244205 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C275/28, C07C275/30, C07D213/82 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
C07D401/10 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (KR);
A61K31/517 (KR);
A61P25/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | IRE1ALPHA-INHIBITOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/38] | English: | IRE1ALPHA INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF | [2023/38] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'IRE1ALPHA ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 20.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010075967 (DIXON JULIE A [US], et al) [A] 1-27* ENTIRE DOCUMENT *; | [A]US9382230 (WALTER PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * ENTIRE DOCUMENT *; | [Y]US2018265497 (BRAUN MARIE-GABRIELLE [US], et al) [Y] 7; 8; 18-21; (22-27)/(7,8,18-21) * para [0008]; [0103]; pg. 10, Tablo 1; pg. 22, Table1 *; | [XY]WO2019094641 (QUENTIS THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-6; 9-17; (22,27)/ (1-6,9-17) * para [0075]; [00130]; [00149]-[00150]; [00154]; [00252] pg. 32 * [Y] 7; 8; 18-21; (22,27)/ (7,8,18-21); 23-26; | [Y]WO2020047518 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 23-26 * (para [0008]; ]; [0014]; [0091]; [0286] * |