EP4244172 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR GRAPPLING INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bianco, William F. 21 Hunters Run Lane Pottstown, PA 19464 / US | For all designated states Ogden, Cory, Allen 113 Adderton Dr. Prince Frederick, MD 20678 / US | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21893014.7 | 16.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021US59501 | Priority number, date | US202063114175P | 16.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063114175 P | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022104253 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4244172 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/62, B65G7/12, B66C1/42, B66F11/00, G21C19/10, G21C19/20, G21C19/32 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
G21C19/32 (EP);
G21C19/02 (US);
B66C1/427 (EP);
B66C1/62 (EP);
G21C19/10 (EP);
G21C19/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM GREIFEN VON INSTRUMENTEN | [2023/38] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR GRAPPLING INSTRUMENTS | [2023/38] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS POUR INSTRUMENT DE PRÉHENSION | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3077361 (ROBERT TAIT, et al); | [Y]EP0509837 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]DE102007034506 (WIMO HEBETECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]KR101109479B ; | [Y]CN203173756U (LIUZHOU ZHOUGONG MACHINERY EQUIPMENT CO LTD, et al); | [XY]US9085944 (LAVALLEY JASON [US], et al); | [Y]KR20190086980 (KIM YUN TAE [KR]) |