EP4244785 - COMPUTATIONALLY-EFFICIENT LOAD PLANNING SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics, Inc. 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUYSUZOGLU, Ahmet Jersey City, New Jersey 07302 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Yue Jersey City, New Jersey 07310 / US | 03 /
HEYDLAUF, Michael Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | 04 /
ZHENG, Luxi Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21893053.5 | 28.10.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021US72085 | Priority number, date | US202063198787P | 13.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063198787 P | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022104311 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4244785 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/0631, G16H10/40, G16H40/63, G01N35/00, G16H40/20 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06315 (EP);
G16H10/40 (EP,US);
G01N35/0092 (EP);
G16H40/20 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G01N2035/0094 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | RECHNERISCH EFFIZIENTE LASTPLANUNGSSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIAGNOSTISCHE LABORE | [2023/38] | English: | COMPUTATIONALLY-EFFICIENT LOAD PLANNING SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORIES | [2023/38] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PLANIFICATION DE CHARGEMENT EFFICACE EN MATIÈRE DE CALCUL DE LABORATOIRES DE DIAGNOSTIC | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005227360 (DEVLIN WILLIAM J SR [US]); | [X]US2014100139 (BARNES LAWRENCE [US], et al); | [XY]EP3299794 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | International search | [Y]US2008113440 (GURNEY PHILLIP CLYDE ROBERTS [AU], et al) [Y] 13-15* , entire document, especially Abstract and para [0128] and [0147]. *; | [Y]US2014100139 (BARNES LAWRENCE [US], et al) [Y] 4-5, 12 * , entire document, especially Abstract and para [0114]. ' *; | [XY]US2016341752 (HOLMES ELIZABETH A [US], et al) [X] 1, 7-8, 10, 19 * , entire document, especially Abstract and para [0042], [0046], [0063], [0067], [0071], [0113], [0126], [0134], [0186], * [Y] 2-6, 9, 11-18; | [Y]US2018080949 (JOST FRIEDRICH [CH], et al) [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 9, 11-18 * , entire document, especially Abstract and para [0016], [0028], [0061], [0066], [0085], [0141], [0162]-[0163], * |