EP4050468 - INFORMATION EXCHANGE METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Bytedance Network Technology Co., Ltd. Room B-0035 2/F Building 3 No.30 Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yijiao Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
HE, Zhejun Beijing 100190 / CN | 03 /
WU, Kefei Beijing 100190 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Chenman Beijing 100190 / CN | 05 /
TAN, Siqi Beijing 100190 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 21893105.3 | 01.12.2021 | [2022/35] | WO2021CN134870 | Priority number, date | CN202011563916 | 25.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011563916 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022135090 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050468 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (KR);
G06F3/04842 (CN);
H04L51/046 (US);
G06F16/74 (CN);
G06F3/005 (KR);
G06F3/04812 (KR);
G06F3/04817 (KR);
G06F3/04847 (CN);
G06F3/0486 (CN);
H04L51/216 (US);
H04N21/478 (US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | G06F3/0484, G06F3/0486, G06F16/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSAUSTAUSCHVERFAHREN UND -GERÄT, VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND PROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2022/35] | English: | INFORMATION EXCHANGE METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2022/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉCHANGE D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2022 | Translation filed | 23.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 01.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2020083021 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,18,19 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0246]; figures 1-10; claims 1-2 *[I] 2-17 |