EP4248034 - A SLIP FORM SYSTEM AND A METHOD OF CONTINUOUSLY FORMING A BUILDING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fastform Corporation Pty Ltd 27 Amherst Street Fremantle, WA 6160 / AU | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOCK, Mike Fremantle, Western Australia 6160 / AU | 02 /
KAPFER, Michael Fremantle, Western Australia 6160 / AU | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte KG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21893134.3 | 17.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021AU51363 | Priority number, date | AU20200904233 | 17.11.2020 Original published format: AU 2020904233 | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022104415 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4248034 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/28, E04G5/00 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
E04G11/22 (EP);
E04G11/24 (EP,US);
E04G21/04 (US);
E04G21/0472 (EP);
E04G21/12 (EP,US);
G05D3/12 (US);
E04C5/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | GLEITSCHALUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG EINER GEBÄUDESTRUKTUR | [2023/39] | English: | A SLIP FORM SYSTEM AND A METHOD OF CONTINUOUSLY FORMING A BUILDING STRUCTURE | [2023/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COFFRAGE GLISSANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION CONTINUE D'UNE STRUCTURE DE BÂTIMENT | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR0131383B (JINSUNG TOGUN CO [KR]) [A] 1-29* claims 1, 2 and figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1541951 (SPECIALTY MINERALS MICHIGAN [US]) [A] 1-29 * claim 1 and figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US9435085 (FREE PATRICK SHAWN [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 12, line 9 - column 13, line 16 and figures 4A-4C *; | [Y]US2018347211 (ZITTING JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,11,12,29 * paragraphs [0092], [0124], claims 9, 14, and figures 19-32 *; | [XYA]WO2020210173 (BUTLER MICHAEL GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10,13-21,24-28 * paragraphs [0115]-[0157] and figures 29-43 * [Y] 6,7,11,12,29 [A] 9,22,23 |