EP4246950 - IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD, DDIC CHIP, AP, DISPLAY SCREEN MODULE AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yankai Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Lei Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
CAI, Huiyue Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21893634.2 | 13.10.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021CN123585 | Priority number, date | CN202011284905 | 17.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011284905 | [2023/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022105485 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4246950 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3208, G09G5/393, H04N1/047, G09G3/3225, G09G5/395, // G09G5/18 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
G09G3/3225 (EP);
H04N1/047 (CN);
G09G3/2096 (US);
G09G3/3208 (US);
G09G5/006 (EP);
G09G5/395 (EP);
H04N1/028 (CN);
G09G2300/0861 (EP);
G09G2310/0237 (EP);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0276 (EP);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0435 (EP,US);
G09G2360/18 (EP);
G09G2370/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | H04N1/047 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVERFAHREN, DDIC-CHIP, AP, ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRMMODUL UND ENDGERÄT | [2023/38] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD, DDIC CHIP, AP, DISPLAY SCREEN MODULE AND TERMINAL | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE, PUCE DDIC, AP, MODULE D'ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE ET TERMINAL | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2023 | Translation filed | 16.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104658491 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD); | [A]US2017251170 (KABUTO NOBUAKI [JP]); | [A]US2020111418 (NAM HUI [KR], et al) |