EP4248180 - HANGING SCALE SENSOR APPARATUS AND A HANGING SCALE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler Toledo (Changzhou) Measurement Technology Ltd. No. 111 West Taihu Road Xinbei District Changzhou, Jiangsu 213125 / CN | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo (Changzhou) Precision Instruments Co., Ltd. No. 5 Huashan Road Xinbei District Changzhou Jiangsu 213022 / CN | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo International Trading (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Part C/3 Floor, No. 456 Fute Road (N) China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai 200131 / CN | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Naiqing hangzhou, Jiangsu 213125 / CN | 02 /
KEMPF, Edgar Inzigkofen / DE | 03 /
KONTSCHAK, Dieter Winterlingen / DE | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Mettler-Toledo IP Department Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21893859.5 | 15.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021CN130658 | Priority number, date | CN202011288629 | 17.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011288629 | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022105712 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4248180 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01G23/00, G01G19/18 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G01G19/18 (EP);
G01G19/14 (CN,US);
G01G21/22 (US);
G01G23/005 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/39] | G01G23/00, G01G19/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | SENSORVORRICHTUNG FÜR HÄNGENDE WAAGE UND HÄNGENDE WAAGE | [2023/39] | English: | HANGING SCALE SENSOR APPARATUS AND A HANGING SCALE | [2023/39] | French: | APPAREIL CAPTEUR DE BALANCE SUSPENDUE ET BALANCE SUSPENDUE | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 02.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101672688 (METTLER TOLEDO CHANGZHOU MEASU, et al); | [A]CN204495457U (HBM SUZHOU ELECTRONIC MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |