EP4199337 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR WIRELESSLY RECEIVING POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Beomwoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jaehyun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Chongmin Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Bohwan Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21894908.9 | 21.10.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021KR14795 | Priority number, date | KR20200154941 | 18.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200154941 | KR20210065693 | 21.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210065693 | [2023/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022108136 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199337 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/12, H02J50/50, H02M1/08, H01F27/40, H01F38/14, H02M3/335, H02M1/34 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H01F38/14 (EP);
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H01F27/40 (EP);
H01F27/42 (US);
H02J50/502 (EP);
H02M1/08 (EP);
H02M1/34 (EP);
H02M3/335 (EP);
H01F2027/408 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | H02M3/335, H02M1/34, H02M1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM DRAHTLOSEN EMPFANGEN VON STROM | [2023/25] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR WIRELESSLY RECEIVING POWER | [2023/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR LA RÉCEPTION DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2023 | Translation filed | 16.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 14.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2014368052 (NORCONK MATTHEW J [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2016111819 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0041] and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2016294221 (MANIKTALA SANJAYA [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0041] and figures 1A-4. *; | [A]KR20180012675 (MAPS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-5 and figures 1-6. *; | [A]US2018304755 (BEAVER JONATHAN [NZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0025]-[0061] and figures 1-4. *; | [A]CN109818427 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0018]-[0035] and figures 1-4. * |