EP4249531 - OLEFIN-BASED POLYMER, FILM PREPARED THEREFROM, AND PREPARATION METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanwha Solutions Corporation 86, Cheonggyecheon-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04541 / KR | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Munhee Daejeon 34128 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sung Dong Daejeon 34128 / KR | 03 /
JOUNG, Ui Gap Daejeon 34128 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jeong Hyun Daejeon 34128 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Hye Ran Daejeon 34128 / KR | 06 /
SEO, Junho Daejeon 34128 / KR | 07 /
LIM, Seongjae Daejeon 34128 / KR | 08 /
JO, Jisong Daejeon 34128 / KR | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21895020.2 | 12.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021KR16517 | Priority number, date | KR20200157561 | 23.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200157561 | [2023/39] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022108252 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4249531 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F4/659, C08F4/6592, C08F2/34 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/34 (KR);
C08F210/14 (KR);
C08F4/025 (US);
C08F4/65904 (KR);
C08F4/65908 (KR);
C08F4/65912 (EP,KR);
C08F4/65925 (KR);
C08F4/76 (US);
C08J5/18 (EP);
C08F2410/04 (US);
C08F2500/12 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/65925 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/10, C08F2500/06, C08F2500/26 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/10, C08F2500/06, C08F2500/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | POLYMER AUF OLEFINBASIS, DARAUS HERGESTELLTER FILM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/39] | English: | OLEFIN-BASED POLYMER, FILM PREPARED THEREFROM, AND PREPARATION METHODS THEREFOR | [2023/39] | French: | POLYMÈRE À BASE D'OLÉFINE, FILM PRÉPARÉ À PARTIR DE CELUI-CI ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉS | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2023 | Translation filed | 25.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002119890 (WENZEL TIMOTHY T [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * See claims 1-35. *; | [X]US2005159300 (JENSEN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0154], [0266]-[0269], [0274], [0376], [0377] and [0387]-[0388]; and claims 1, 11, 12, 18, 32, 34 and 36-38. *; | [A]WO2012033670 (CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-16* See claims 1-32. *; | [A]JP2015113282 (KOEI CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0002] and [0042]. *; | [A]US2016362510 (RIX FRANCIS C [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0200]-[0214]; and claims 17, 20, 21, 23, 25-27, 30 and 32. *; | [A]WO2019027585 (EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * See claims 1-28. * |