EP4231446 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING PLURALITY OF ANTENNAS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 16.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Daehee Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Janghoon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
SEO, Chonghwa Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Jongwon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21895023.6 | 12.11.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021KR16528 | Priority number, date | KR20200156850 | 20.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200156850 | [2023/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022108255 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4231446 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H03F3/60, H01Q3/26, H01Q1/52, H04B1/04 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H03F3/68 (EP);
H01Q1/243 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q3/28 (EP,US);
H01Q1/52 (KR);
H01Q3/26 (KR);
H03F3/195 (EP);
H03F3/245 (EP,US);
H03F3/602 (KR);
H03G3/3042 (EP);
H04B1/0483 (EP);
H03F2200/105 (EP);
H03F2200/211 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/34] | H01Q1/24, H03F3/60, H01Q3/26, H01Q1/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN ANTENNEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2023/34] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING PLURALITY OF ANTENNAS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2023/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UNE PLURALITÉ D'ANTENNES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2023 | Translation filed | 16.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 15.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000183762 (NEC CORP); | [A]US2012299765 (HUANG YIKUN [US], et al); | [A]KR20170003837 (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN RES & BUS [KR]); | [A]CN111147100 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD); | [A]US2020186400 (LEE YOUNGMIN [KR], et al); | [A]EP3675548 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]JP2000183762 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0036] and claim 1. *; | [A]KR20180041470 (RESEARCH & BUSINESS FOUND SUNGKYUNKWAN UNIV [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0004]-[0042], claims 1 and 12 and figure 3. *; | [A]KR20190031839 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0167] and figures 1-10. *; | [A]JP2020507230 (INTEL CORPORATION) [A] 1-15* See claim 1 and figure 1A. *; | [A]KR20200071491 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0297] and figures 1-12. * |