EP4230743 - MICROORGANISM HAVING ENHANCED L-GLUTAMINE PRODUCING ABILITY, AND L-GLUTAMINE PRODUCING METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 09.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ Cheiljedang Corporation 330, Dongho-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Su Jin Seoul 04560 / KR | 02 /
YANG, Sunyoung Seoul 04560 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Kwang Woo Seoul 04560 / KR | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/34] | Heubeck, Christian Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21895150.7 | 19.11.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021KR17074 | Priority number, date | KR20200156903 | 20.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200156903 | [2023/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022108383 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230743 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/77, C12N9/88, C12P13/14 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
C12N9/88 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/77 (EP,KR,US);
C12P13/14 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y401/01032 (EP,KR,US);
C12R2001/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | MIKROORGANISMUS MIT VERBESSERTER L-GLUTAMIN-PRODUKTIONSFÄHIGKEIT UND L-GLUTAMIN-HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2023/34] | English: | MICROORGANISM HAVING ENHANCED L-GLUTAMINE PRODUCING ABILITY, AND L-GLUTAMINE PRODUCING METHOD USING SAME | [2023/34] | French: | MICROORGANISME AYANT UNE CAPACITÉ DE PRODUCTION DE L-GLUTAMINE AMÉLIORÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE L-GLUTAMINE L'UTILISANT | [2023/34] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2023 | Translation filed | 15.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1094111 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al); | [Y]WO2005058945 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [Y]US2020063172 (ENGEL PHILIP [DE], et al); | International search | [A]US2002065403 (EIKMANNS BERNHARD [DE], et al); | [A]KR20160025884 (CJ CHEILJEDANG CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20160041624 (CJ CHEILJEDANG CORP [KR]); | [A]KR101869642B (DAESANG CORP [KR]); | by applicant | JPH1048440 | US7262035 | KR20090094433 | US7662943 | US2010048440 | US10584338 | WO2021177731 | US20020273491 |