EP4247146 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR POLLINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polybee Pte. Ltd. 68 Circular Road 02-01 Singapore 049422 / SG | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JADHAV SIDDHARTH SUNIL, Siddharth Sunil Singapore 119613 / SG | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21895251.3 | 19.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021SG50714 | Priority number, date | SG20201011643V | 23.11.2020 Original published format: SG10202011643V | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022108533 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4247146 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01H1/02, B64C39/02 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
A01H1/02 (EP);
A01H1/027 (US);
B64U10/13 (EP,US);
B64U10/80 (EP,US);
B64U50/38 (EP,US);
B64U50/39 (US);
B64U2101/00 (EP,US);
B64U2101/30 (EP,US);
B64U2101/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTÄUBUNG | [2023/39] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR POLLINATION | [2023/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE POLLINISATION | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CN103238513B (UNIV SOUTH CHINA AGRICULT); | [X]CN106069724 (JIANGSU HONGQI SEED CO LTD); | [X]JP2017012137 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [X]CN109588305 (UNIV JIANGSU) |