Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4248251 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP21895369 US2021058710W US202318196644



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023296855Global Dossier 21.09.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202063115836 19.11.2020
WO2021US58710 10.11.2021
US202318196644 12.05.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4248251Global Dossier 23.10.2024A4
EP4248251 27.09.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202063115836 19.11.2020
WO2021US58710 10.11.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022108796Global Dossier 27.05.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202063115836 19.11.2020