EP4247421 - DESIGN OF OPTIMIZED UNIVERSAL INFLUENZA VACCINES, THEIR DESIGNS AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greffex, Inc. 1502 Augusta Dr., Suite 120 Houston, TX 77057 / US | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAERZ, Uwe, D. Denver, CO 80207 / US | 02 /
SPEAR, Philip, C. Aurora, CO 80017 / US | 03 /
QI, Yan Lone Tree, CO 80213 / US | 04 /
CULL, Janae, Wheeler Brighton, CO 80603 / US | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21895596.1 | 18.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021US59915 | Priority number, date | US202063115459P | 18.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063115459 P | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022109152 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4247421 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/145, A61P31/16, C07K14/005, C12N15/86, A61K39/00 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,KR);
A61K39/145 (KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP,KR,US);
G16B25/00 (KR);
C12N2710/10343 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | ENTWURF OPTIMIERTER UNIVERSELLER INFLUENZAIMPFSTOFFE, DEREN DESIGNS UND VERWENDUNGEN | [2023/39] | English: | DESIGN OF OPTIMIZED UNIVERSAL INFLUENZA VACCINES, THEIR DESIGNS AND USES | [2023/39] | French: | CONCEPTION DE VACCINS UNIVERSELS OPTIMISÉS CONTRE LA GRIPPE, LEURS CONCEPTIONS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013052223 (MOOKAN PRABAKARAN [SG], et al); | [A]US2016151480 (ZENG MINGTAO [US], et al); | [A]US2019022209 (JONES FRANK R [US], et al); | [A]US2019365882 (SEONG BAIK LIN [KR], et al); |