EP4254930 - IMAGE SENSOR, CAMERA MODULE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Peide Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 02 /
HU, Kongming Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21897009.3 | 24.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021CN132700 | Priority number, date | CN202011373308 | 30.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011373308 | [2023/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022111508 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4254930 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N25/77, H04N25/51, H04N25/78, // H04N25/57, H04N25/61, H04N23/57 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H04N25/78 (EP);
H04N25/778 (KR);
H04N23/54 (CN,KR);
H04N25/75 (US);
H04N23/55 (CN,KR);
H04N23/57 (EP,CN,KR);
H04N23/611 (EP);
H04N23/71 (US);
H04N23/76 (EP,US);
H04N25/10 (KR);
H04N25/51 (EP,KR);
H04N25/60 (CN,KR);
H04N25/70 (CN);
H04N25/77 (EP);
H04N25/772 (KR,US);
H04N25/61 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | H04N5/225, H04N5/357, H04N5/369 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | BILDSENSOR, KAMERAMODUL UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/40] | English: | IMAGE SENSOR, CAMERA MODULE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/40] | French: | CAPTEUR D'IMAGE, MODULE DE CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2023 | Translation filed | 21.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 24.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE19652477 (WOLF HENNING [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 12; claims 1-15 * [Y] 4-8,10[I] 9,11; | [XYI]US6339363 (FOWLER BOYD [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 9; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4-8,10 [I] 9,11; | [XYI]US2006146159 (FARRIER MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046]; figure 5A * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0098]; figures 15A-15C * [Y] 4-8,10 [I] 9,11; | [Y]US7098945 (SASAI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 4-8,10 * columns 4-7, line 51 - column 5, line 47; figures 2-3 * * column 8, line 41 - column 8, line 62; figures 10A-10B * |