Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
02.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
02.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.07.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
21.07.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
02.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.05.2023 | Change - representative | |
19.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.06.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |