Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11914247 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2024 | B2 | US2023305332 | 28.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202011384672 | 30.11.2020 | WO2021CN133915 | 29.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230101916 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202011384672 | 30.11.2020 | WO2021CN133915 | 29.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023552154 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202011384672 | 30.11.2020 | WO2021CN133915 | 29.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4231088 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A4 | EP4231088 | 23.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202011384672 | 30.11.2020 | WO2021CN133915 | 29.11.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022111679 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202011384672 | 30.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114578614 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202011384672 | 30.11.2020 |